Directorate Change (4811D)
16 Maggio 2012 - 2:34PM
UK Regulatory
TIDMBODI
RNS Number : 4811D
Bodisen Biotech Inc
16 May 2012
Bodisen Biotech, Inc.
("Bodisen" or the "Company")
Directorate Change
The Board of Bodisen wishes to announce that on 19 April 2012,
Bo Chen, stepped down as Chairman of the Board, effective
immediately for health reasons. Mr. Chen will remain a director of
the Company.
The Board also wishes to announce that on 19 April 2012 the
Company appointed Mr. Lin Wang as Chairman of the Board, effective
immediately as Bo Chen's replacement.
Mr. Wang, aged 43, has been the Chief Executive Officer and
President of the Company since April 29, 2011. He was general
manager of Bodisen from 1999 to 2011. From 1997 to 1999, Mr. Wang
worked at Yangling Kangyuan Agricultural Chemical Co. Ltd, a
fertilizer company where he was general manager between 1997 and
1999. Mr. Wang graduated from Northwest Agriculture University, in
Yangling, Shaanxi in 1989 where he studied agricultural economic
management. Mr. Wang Lin holds an agronomist certification awarded
by the Peoples Republic of China. He is the younger brother of
Qiong Wang, the founder of the Company.
Save as disclosed above, there is no further information to
disclose in respect of Lin Wang under Schedule 2 paragraph (g) of
the AIM Rules.
Enquiries:
Bodisen Biotech, Inc.
Lin Wang (Chief Executive Officer) 0086 29 8707 4957
Charles Stanley Securities
(Nominated Adviser)
Russell Cook / Carl Holmes 020 7149 6000
This information is provided by RNS
The company news service from the London Stock Exchange
END
BOAFMGMKZVFGZZM
Grafico Azioni Bodisen Biotech (LSE:BODI)
Storico
Da Ago 2024 a Set 2024
Grafico Azioni Bodisen Biotech (LSE:BODI)
Storico
Da Set 2023 a Set 2024
Notizie in Tempo Reale relative a Bodisen (Borsa di Londra): 0 articoli recenti
Più Bodisen Biotech Articoli Notizie